The Superintendents
Telesforo Lina - September 8, 1975 – 1980
Manuel Taglorin - 1980 – 1983
Atty. Marcelo Jalandoon - July 1983 – 1985
Estrella Navales - December 1985 – September 1989
Teresita Dayot - September 1989 – 1994
Teodosio Borres - July 25, 1994 – July 1996
Emolyn Corteza - July 1996 – June 1998
Milagros S. Gonzales - June 1998 – 1999
Alberto A. Febrero - September 30, 1999 – November 24, 2006
Dr. Juliet A. Jeruta - OIC - Nov. 25, 2006 – Aug. 7, 2006
Mrs. Mildred L. Garay - August 8, 2006 – April 7, 2008
Mrs. Ma. Gemma M. Ledesma - April 8, 2008 – November 3, 2009
Milagros S. Gonzales, Ph.D. - November 3, 2009 - Present
No comments:
Post a Comment